Senate | 05/28/2014 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/14/2014 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/14/2014 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/08/2014 | Public Act 14-44 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2014 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/02/2014 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/25/2014 | House Calendar Number 464 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2014 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 04/15/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/14/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/11/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | File Number 280 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 217 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/03/2014 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |