Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Public Act 14-30
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
House Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
House Calendar Number 444
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2014
|
File Number 566
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 375
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2014
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2014
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|