Senate
|
06/13/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
Special Act 14-21
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 5224
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5236
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
House Calendar Number 446
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3735
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
File Number 481
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 311
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/14
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|