Senate | 04/22/2014 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/14/2014 | File Number 519 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 350 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/07/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/28/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Public Hearing 03/10 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |