Senate | 05/05/2014 | File Number 759 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/02/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/07/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 05/02/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/02/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 04/29/2014 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | File Number 610 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 402 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Public Hearing 03/10 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |