Senate | 03/24/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/24/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/21/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/07/2014 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |