Senate | 05/28/2014 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/14/2014 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/14/2014 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/09/2014 | Special Act 14-5 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2014 | House Calendar Number 429 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 3711 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | File Number 426 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 288 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/24/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/10/2014 | Public Hearing 03/14 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |