Senate
|
06/13/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
Special Act 14-22
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
House Calendar Number 482
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4572
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2014
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
File Number 391
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 254
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/12
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|