Senate
|
06/13/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Public Act 14-212
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Calendar Number 541
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 5583
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5110
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2014
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
File Number 459
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 293
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/12
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|