Senate
|
06/06/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Public Act 14-90
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
House Calendar Number 531
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5529
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2014
|
File Number 577
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 388
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2014
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2014
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/17
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|