House | 05/08/2014 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/02/2014 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/02/2014 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/01/2014 | Public Act 14-3 | ||
House | 04/25/2014 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 04/25/2014 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/25/2014 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/25/2014 | Rules Suspended | ||
House | 04/25/2014 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House | ||
Senate | 04/25/2014 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 04/25/2014 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4382 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | File Number 619 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 412 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/11/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/27/2014 | Public Hearing 03/31 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |