House | 04/02/2015 | File Number 394 | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | House Calendar Number 252 | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 01/23/2015 | Public Hearing 01/29 | ||
House | 01/13/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |