House | 04/08/2015 | File Number 509 | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | House Calendar Number 315 | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 01/30/2015 | Public Hearing 02/04 | ||
House | 01/21/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |