House | 04/08/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | File Number 304 | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | House Calendar Number 186 | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 01/30/2015 | Public Hearing 02/05 | ||
House | 01/29/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |