Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Public Act 15-150
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 609
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
File Number 905
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7249
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
File Number 305
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
House Calendar Number 187
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2015
|
Public Hearing 01/29
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|