House | 04/07/2015 | File Number 453 | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | House Calendar Number 282 | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/04/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Public Hearing 02/20 | ||
House | 01/21/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |