House
|
06/03/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 652
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9307
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
No New File by Committee on General Law
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on General Law
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
File Number 510
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
House Calendar Number 316
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/11
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|