House
|
06/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Public Act 15-115
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2015
|
File Number 743
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 434
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6432
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
File Number 511
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
House Calendar Number 317
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2015
|
Public Hearing 01/29
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|