Senate | 05/30/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 607 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 05/27/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | File Number 398 | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | House Calendar Number 256 | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/04/2015 | Public Hearing 02/10 | ||
House | 01/22/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
House | 01/21/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 01/20/2015 | Vote to Draft |