House | 03/24/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | File Number 35 | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | House Calendar Number 55 | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/04/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/26/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
House | 02/05/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
House | 02/04/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 01/29/2015 | Vote to Draft |