House | 04/08/2015 | No Action | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | File Number 185 | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | House Calendar Number 129 | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging | ||
House | 02/24/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/06/2015 | Public Hearing 02/10 |