House | 03/31/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/13/2015 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/05/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |