House | 02/20/2015 | File Number 7 | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | House Calendar Number 40 | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/13/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/19/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/10/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 01/28/2015 | Public Hearing 02/05 | ||
House | 01/20/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |