House | 04/27/2015 | File Number 746 | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | House Calendar Number 490 | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/27/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Public Hearing 03/23 | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Vote to Draft |