House | 03/17/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | File Number 21 | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | House Calendar Number 48 | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/04/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 01/30/2015 | Public Hearing 02/05 | ||
House | 01/21/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |