House | 03/25/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
House | 01/29/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |