House | 07/10/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/25/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/25/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/16/2015 | Public Act 15-201 | ||
House | 06/03/2015 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/03/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 06/03/2015 | Rules Suspended | ||
House | 06/03/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 655 | ||
House | 06/03/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 06/03/2015 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 06/02/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | File Number 567 | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | House Calendar Number 357 | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Public Hearing 03/20 | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Vote to Draft |