House | 05/30/2015 | Bill Passed Temporarily | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | File Number 219 | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | House Calendar Number 150 | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/20/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/18/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
House | 02/17/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Vote to Draft |