House | 04/30/2015 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | File Number 568 | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | House Calendar Number 358 | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Public Hearing 03/20 | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Vote to Draft |