House | 05/11/2015 | File Number 807 | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 483 | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6870 | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | File Number 569 | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | House Calendar Number 359 | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Public Hearing 03/20 | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Vote to Draft |