Connecticut 2015 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05733 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 5733
2-January Session, 2015 *_____HB05733ENV___032615____*
1+General Assembly Committee Bill No. 5733
2+January Session, 2015 LCO No. 4361
3+ *04361HB05733ENV*
4+Referred to Committee on ENVIRONMENT
5+Introduced by:
6+(ENV)
37
48 General Assembly
59
6-Substitute Bill No. 5733
10+Committee Bill No. 5733
711
812 January Session, 2015
913
10-*_____HB05733ENV___032615____*
14+LCO No. 4361
1115
12-AN ACT AUTHORIZING THE STATE TREASURER TO DIVEST FUNDS FROM FOSSIL FUEL COMPANIES.
16+*04361HB05733ENV*
17+
18+Referred to Committee on ENVIRONMENT
19+
20+Introduced by:
21+
22+(ENV)
23+
24+AN ACT REQUIRING THE STATE TREASURER TO DIVEST FUNDS FROM FOSSIL FUEL COMPANIES.
1325
1426 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
1527
1628 Section 1. (NEW) (Effective October 1, 2015) (a) For the purposes of this section:
1729
18-(1) "Company" means any corporation, utility, partnership, joint venture, franchisor, franchisee, trust, entity investment vehicle, financial institution or other entity or business association, including all wholly-owned subsidiaries, majority-owned subsidiaries, parent companies or affiliates of such entities or business associations, that exist for the purpose of making profit;
30+(1) "Company" means any corporation, utility, partnership, joint venture, franchisor, franchisee, trust, entity investment vehicle, financial institution or other entity or business association, including all wholly-owned subsidiaries, majority-owned subsidiaries, parent companies or affiliates of such entities or business associations, that exist for the purpose of making profit; and
1931
20-(2) "Fossil fuel company" means any company that is involved in the exploration and production of fuel that is formed from plant or animal remains, including coal, oil or natural gas; and
32+(2) "Invest" means the commitment of funds or other assets to a company, including, but not limited to, the ownership or control of a share or interest in the company, and the ownership or control of a bond or other debt instrument by the company.
2133
22-(3) "Investment" means the commitment of state pension funds or other assets to a company through an actively managed investment account that holds publicly traded equities. "Investment" does not include an investment in a passive index fund or a private commingled fund in which state funds are invested.
34+(b) The State Treasurer shall review the major investment holdings of the state for the purpose of determining the extent to which state funds are invested in fossil fuel companies.
2335
24-(b) The State Treasurer shall review the major investments of the state for the purpose of determining the extent to which state funds are invested in fossil fuel companies. Whenever feasible and consistent with the fiduciary duties of the Treasurer, the Treasurer shall encourage fossil fuel companies in which state funds are invested to take actions to reduce environmental harm and preserve the sustainability of such companies.
36+(c) (1) The State Treasurer shall take the following actions in relation to state funds invested in fossil fuel companies prior to the date of this section: (A) The State Treasurer shall sell, redeem, divest or withdraw all publicly traded securities of each company identified in subsection (b) of this section according to the following schedule: (i) Not less than twenty per cent of such assets shall be removed from the State Treasurer's assets under management not later than October 1, 2016, (ii) forty per cent of such assets shall be removed from the State Treasurer's assets under management not later than October 1, 2017, (iii) sixty per cent of such assets shall be removed from the State Treasurer's assets under management not later than October 1, 2018, (iv) eighty per cent of such assets shall be removed from the State Treasurer's assets under management not later than October 1, 2019, and (v) one hundred per cent of such assets shall be removed from the State Treasurer's assets under management not later than October 1, 2020; and (B) The State Treasurer shall, at least once per fiscal year, provide reports to the Investment Advisory Council on actions taken by the State Treasurer pursuant to the provisions of this subdivision.
2537
26-(c) The Treasurer may divest, decide to not further invest state funds or to not enter into any future investment in any fossil fuel company. In the event that the Treasurer determines that divestment of state funds from a fossil fuel company is warranted, the Treasurer shall give notice of such determination to such company.
27-
28-(d) The Treasurer shall, at least once per fiscal year, provide reports to the Investment Advisory Council on actions taken by the Treasurer pursuant to the provisions of this section.
38+(2) The State Treasurer shall not further invest state funds in any fossil fuel company.
2939
3040
3141
3242
3343 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3444 Section 1 October 1, 2015 New section
3545
3646 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3747
3848 Section 1
3949
4050 October 1, 2015
4151
4252 New section
4353
54+Statement of Purpose:
55+
56+To require the State Treasurer to divest investments in fossil fuel companies and not further invest in such companies in order to discourage the extraction of fossil fuels and avoid a significant increase in global warming.
57+
58+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]
4459
4560
46-ENV Joint Favorable Subst.
4761
48-ENV
62+Co-Sponsors: REP. MUSHINSKY, 85th Dist.; REP. ALBIS, 99th Dist.
4963
50-Joint Favorable Subst.
64+Co-Sponsors:
65+
66+REP. MUSHINSKY, 85th Dist.; REP. ALBIS, 99th Dist.
67+
68+H.B. 5733