House | 07/02/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/18/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/18/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/16/2015 | Public Act 15-202 | ||
House | 06/03/2015 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/03/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 643 | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | File Number 308 | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | House Calendar Number 190 | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/26/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Public Hearing 02/24 |