House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 630
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
File Number 669
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
House Calendar Number 431
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2015
|
Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2015
|
Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|