House | 05/18/2015 | File Number 846 | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 534 | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 7267 | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 6388 | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Bill Passed Temporarily | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | House Designated House Amendment Schedule A 6388 | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | File Number 309 | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | House Calendar Number 191 | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/26/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Public Hearing 02/24 |