House | 03/31/2015 | File Number 310 | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | House Calendar Number 192 | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services | ||
House | 03/06/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 01/30/2015 | Public Hearing 02/05 | ||
House | 01/29/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |