House | 03/17/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | File Number 36 | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | House Calendar Number 56 | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/04/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
House | 02/05/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
House | 02/04/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/03/2015 | Vote to Draft |