House | 04/30/2015 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | File Number 356 | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | House Calendar Number 213 | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
House | 03/04/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/10/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
House | 02/05/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |