House | 02/11/2015 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 02/10/2015 | Change of Reference Public Health | ||
House | 02/05/2015 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | ||
House | 02/05/2015 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | ||
House | 02/04/2015 | Change of Reference Human Services | ||
House | 01/21/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |