House | 02/19/2015 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/18/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
House | 02/17/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/05/2015 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Environment | ||
House | 02/05/2015 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Environment | ||
House | 02/04/2015 | Change of Reference Environment | ||
House | 01/21/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |