House | 04/14/2015 | File Number 623 | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | House Calendar Number 393 | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |