House
|
07/02/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2015
|
Public Act 15-203
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2015
|
File Number 744
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 436
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6357
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
File Number 647
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
House Calendar Number 406
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/23
|
|
|