House
|
05/26/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Public Act 15-11
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
File Number 788
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 479
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6863
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
File Number 573
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
House Calendar Number 363
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/20
|
|
|