LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2015 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB05938
Action History
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB05938
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2015 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB05938
Action History
House
03/05/2015
Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
House
03/05/2015
Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
House
03/04/2015
Change of Reference Judiciary
House
02/06/2015
Public Hearing 02/11
House
02/04/2015
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
House
01/21/2015
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation