House | 05/11/2015 | File Number 801 | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | House Calendar Number 539 | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/11/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/04/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/05/2015 | Public Hearing 02/09 | ||
House | 02/04/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |