House
|
05/07/2015
|
File Number 783
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 451
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6220
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
File Number 516
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
House Calendar Number 322
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2015
|
Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2015
|
Change of Reference Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|