Senate | 07/02/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/18/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/17/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/15/2015 | Public Act 15-152 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 617 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 05/29/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | File Number 517 | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | House Calendar Number 323 | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Public Hearing 03/17 | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2015 | Vote to Draft |