House | 03/17/2015 | File Number 73 | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | House Calendar Number 69 | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 01/23/2015 | Public Hearing 02/04 | ||
House | 01/22/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |