Senate | 07/02/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/18/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/18/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/16/2015 | Public Act 15-204 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2015 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/03/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 604 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 05/27/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | File Number 576 | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | House Calendar Number 366 | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Public Hearing 03/20 | ||
House | 01/22/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |