House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 639
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7837
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
File Number 577
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
House Calendar Number 367
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/27
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|