House | 06/03/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 653 | ||
House | 06/03/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 06/02/2015 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 06/02/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | File Number 458 | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | House Calendar Number 287 | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/20/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
House | 02/13/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |